EP3162290 - TOMOGRAPHY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LARGE-VOLUME RECORDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare GmbH Henkestraße 127 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Divoky, Robert Wallstraße 15A 91301 Forchheim / DE | [2017/18] | Application number, filing date | 16191079.9 | 28.09.2016 | [2017/18] | Priority number, date | DE201510221418 | 02.11.2015 Original published format: DE102015221418 | [2017/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3162290 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/02, A61B6/03, A61B6/00 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
A61B6/025 (EP,CN,US);
G01T1/2985 (US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/40 (CN);
A61B6/4014 (EP,US);
A61B6/4441 (EP,CN,US);
A61B6/504 (CN);
A61B6/505 (CN);
G01N21/6456 (US);
G01N23/046 (US);
G01T1/2964 (US);
G01N2201/1035 (US);
G01N2223/419 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TOMOGRAPHIEANLAGE UND VERFAHREN FÜR GROSSVOLUMIGE AUFNAHMEN | [2017/18] | English: | TOMOGRAPHY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LARGE-VOLUME RECORDINGS | [2017/18] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TOMOGRAPHIE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENREGISTREMENT À GRANDE ÉCHELLE | [2017/18] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/22] | 11.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE102006021372 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0037]; figure - * [Y] 8; | [XY]JP2009050379 (SHIMADZU CORP) [X] 1-6,9,10 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0030]; figure - * [Y] 8; | [Y]US2011255657 (NOORDHOEK NICOLAAS JAN [NL]) [Y] 8* paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0046]; figure - *; | [XY]DE102014201645 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,5-7,9,10 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0046]; figure - * [Y] 8 | by applicant | DE102006040934 |