Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3165991 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2018 | B1 | EP3165991 | 10.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1559236 | 30.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3041780 | 03.11.2017 | B1 | FR3041780 | 31.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1559236 | 30.09.2015 |