Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
13.02.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.02.2018 | Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
15.06.2017 | Change - classification | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
15.06.2017 | Change - classification | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
02.06.2017 | Publication of search report | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] |
03.03.2017 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] |
03.03.2017 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
03.03.2017 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] |
30.09.2016 | Change - representative |