Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017064706 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2015193916 | 30.09.2015 | JP2015193913 | 30.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017064643 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2015193915 | 30.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017064642 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2015193914 | 30.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017087586 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015193916 | 30.09.2015 | JP2015193915 | 30.09.2015 | JP2015193914 | 30.09.2015 | JP2015193913 | 30.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106987155 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2015193916 | 30.09.2015 | JP2015193915 | 30.09.2015 | JP2015193914 | 30.09.2015 | JP2015193913 | 30.09.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3150289 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2017 | A3 | EP3150289 | 05.04.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2015193916 | 30.09.2015 | JP2015193915 | 30.09.2015 | JP2015193914 | 30.09.2015 | JP2015193913 | 30.09.2015 |