EP3150289 - METHOD FOR FORMING A COATING FILM AND A FUNCTIONAL MEMBER COMPRISING THE COATING FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toto Ltd. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHICHI, Tetsuya TOTO LTD. 1-1 Nakashima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku, Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 02 /
IKEDO, Mami TOTO LTD. 1-1 Nakashima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku, Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 03 /
KATAOKA, Kyoko TOTO LTD. 1-1 Nakashima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku, Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 16191637.4 | 30.09.2016 | [2017/14] | Priority number, date | JP20150193913 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015193913 | JP20150193914 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015193914 | JP20150193915 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015193915 | JP20150193916 | 30.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015193916 | [2017/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3150289 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3150289 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B05D5/04, B05D1/28, B05D5/02 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
B05D5/02 (EP,US);
C09D1/00 (CN);
B05D3/007 (US);
B05D1/02 (US);
B05D1/28 (EP,US);
C03C17/001 (CN);
C03C17/002 (CN);
B05D2203/35 (EP,US);
B05D2401/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BESCHICHTUNGSFILMS UND FUNKTIONELLES ELEMENT MIT DEM BESCHICHTUNGSFILM | [2017/14] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING A COATING FILM AND A FUNCTIONAL MEMBER COMPRISING THE COATING FILM | [2017/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN FILM DE REVÊTEMENT ET ÉLÉMENT FONCTIONNEL COMPRENANT LE FILM DE REVÊTEMENT | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 30.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 14.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO03029373 (LORD CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,10 * example 9; claims 13, 15 * [Y] 5; | [X]EP1627860 (WAGNER FRIEDRICH [AT]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * paragraph [0092]; examples 6,7; claim 1 *; | [XI]JP2006065302 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 13 * abstract * [I] 14-19; | [Y]DE202007014736U (BUERKLE GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0033]; figure - *; | [XI]JP2008132420 (KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS TECH) [X] 13 * abstract * [I] 14-19; | [A]US2009015927 (MATSUMURA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; example -; claim - *; | [XI]EP2144094 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 13 * figure -; example -; claim - * [I] 14-19; | [A]WO2011126148 (RICOH CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; example -; claim - *; | [XI]DE102010036454 (FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO OG [AT]) [X] 13 * figure -; example -; claim - *[I] 14-19; | [XI]US2012171419 (RUSSELL JODI LYNN [US], et al) [X] 13 * figure -; example -; claims 1,18,23,28 * [I] 14-19; | [A]US2013085218 (TIAN DONG [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; example -; claim - *; | [XI]DE102012103491 (FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO OG [AT]) [X] 13 * figure -; example -; claim - * [I] 14-19 | by applicant | WO9803607 | JPH10337526 | JP2000246115 |