Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3305908 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2019 | B1 | EP3305908 | 11.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16192488 | 05.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2755385T | 22.04.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16192488 | 05.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20192036T | 07.02.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP16192488 | 05.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE046612T | 30.03.2020 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP16192488 | 05.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3305908T | 31.01.2020 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP16192488 | 05.10.2016 |