EP3305908 - LIQUID NUTRIENT MEDIUM FOR THE CULTIVATION OF CLOSTRIDIA WHICH IS HAZARDOUS FOR THE CHEESE-MAKING INDUSTRY AND DETECTION OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SY-LAB Vertriebsgesellschaft m.b.H. Tullnerbachstrasse 61-65 3011 Neupurkersdorf / AT | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brändle, Johanna Favoritenstraße 44/22 1040 Wien / AT | 02 /
Domig, Konrad Forsthausgasse 10/B1/12 1200 Wien / AT | 03 /
Schinkinger, Manfred Am Südblick 7/6 3550 Langenlois / AT | 04 /
Stocker, Wolfgang Am Saatzen 4A Stg. 4/13 2721 Bad Fischau / AT | [2019/32] |
Former [2018/15] | 01 /
Brändle, Johanna Favoritenstraße 44/22 1040 Wien / AT | ||
02 /
Domig, Konrad Forsthausgasse 10/B1/12 1200 Wien / AT | |||
03 /
Schinkinger, Manfred Am Südblick 7/6 3550 Langenlois / AT | |||
04 /
Stocker, Wolfgang Pappelgasse 22 2624 Breitenau / AT | Representative(s) | Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH Patentanwälte Wipplingerstraße 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte OG Patentanwälte Wipplingerstraße 30 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 16192488.1 | 05.10.2016 | [2018/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3305908 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3305908 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/04, C12N1/20 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
C12N1/20 (EP);
C12Q1/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] |
Former [2018/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGES NÄHRMEDIUM FÜR DIE KULTIVIERUNG KÄSEREISCHÄDLICHER CLOSTRIDIEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN NACHWEIS | [2018/15] | English: | LIQUID NUTRIENT MEDIUM FOR THE CULTIVATION OF CLOSTRIDIA WHICH IS HAZARDOUS FOR THE CHEESE-MAKING INDUSTRY AND DETECTION OF SAME | [2018/15] | French: | MILIEU DE CULTURE LIQUIDE POUR LA CULTURE DE CLOSTRIDIUM PATHOGÈNE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE DÉTECTEUR | [2018/15] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 03.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.08.2019 | CY | 14.08.2019 | DK | 14.08.2019 | EE | 14.08.2019 | FI | 14.08.2019 | LT | 14.08.2019 | LV | 14.08.2019 | MC | 14.08.2019 | MK | 14.08.2019 | MT | 14.08.2019 | PL | 14.08.2019 | RO | 14.08.2019 | RS | 14.08.2019 | SE | 14.08.2019 | SK | 14.08.2019 | SM | 14.08.2019 | TR | 14.08.2019 | LU | 05.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | BG | 14.11.2019 | NO | 14.11.2019 | IS | 14.12.2019 | PT | 16.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
MT | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LU | 05.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LU | 05.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LU | 05.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LU | 05.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LU | 05.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 14.08.2019 | |
NO | 14.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2006304698 (ASAHI SOFT DRINKS CO LTD) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0058] - [0060]; example 1 * [Y] 2-8; | [Y]WO2015184454 (UNIV CASE WESTERN RESERVE [US]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0022] , [ 0023] , [ 0035]; table 1 *; | [XY] - ANDERS JONSSON, "Enumeration and Confirmation of Clostridium tyrobutyricum in Silages Using Neutral Red, D-Cycloserine, and Lactate Dehydrogenase Activity", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE., US, (19900301), vol. 73, no. 3, doi:10.3168/jds.S0022-0302(90)78725-5, ISSN 0022-0302, pages 719 - 725, XP055349159 [X] 1,6,8 * page 719, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 720, column 1, paragraph 3 * [Y] 2-5,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3168/jds.S0022-0302(90)78725-5 | [X] - LAURENCE GIRBAL ET AL, "How neutral red modified carbon and electron flow in Clostridium acetobutylicum grown in chemostat culture at neutral pH", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY REVIEWS, (19950101), vol. 16, pages 151 - 162, XP055351956 [X] 1 * page 152, column 1, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - M R POPOFF, "Selective medium for isolation of Clostridium butyricum from human feces", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, US, (19840901), vol. 20, no. 3, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 417 - 420, XP055352382 [Y] 3-5 * page 419, column 2 * | [Y] - LEO KAUFMAN ET AL, "USE OF NEUTRAL RED FLUORESCENCE FOR THE IDENTIFICATION OF COLONIES OF CLOSTRIDIA", J BACTERIOL., (19600201), vol. 79, no. 2, page 292, XP055349168 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * | [AD] - BRÄNDLE J ET AL, "Relevance and analysis of butyric acid producing clostridia in milk and cheese", FOOD CONTROL, BUTTERWORTH, LONDON, GB, (20160227), vol. 67, doi:10.1016/J.FOODCONT.2016.02.038, ISSN 0956-7135, pages 96 - 113, XP029492467 [AD] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodcont.2016.02.038 | Examination | EP3190173 | by applicant | - ABGRALL B.; BOURGEOIS C.; BOURVA F., LAIT, (1985), vol. 65, pages 45 - 53 | - BATINA P.; ARNOLD F.; BEDOUET L.; ROBREAU G.; TALBOT F.; MALCOSTE, JOURNAL OF APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 82, pages 619 - 624 | - BERGERE J.L; SIVELÄ S., BULLETIN OF THE INTERNATIONAL DAIRY FEDERATION, (1990), pages 18 - 23 | - BLASCHEK H.P., Encyclopedia of Food Microbiology, (1999), pages 428 - 451 | - BOURGEOIS C.M.; LE PARC O.; ABGRALL B.; CLERTE J., JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 67, pages 2493 - 2499 | - BRÄNDLE J.; DOMIG J.; KNEIFEL W., FOOD CONTROL, (2016), vol. 67, pages 96 - 113 | - HIRSCH A; GRINSTEAD E., J. DAIRY. RES., (1954), vol. 21, pages 101 - 110 | - JONSSON A., JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 73, pages 719 - 725 | - JULIEN M.C.; DION P.; LAFRENIERE C.; ANTOUN H.; DROUIN P, APPLIED AN ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2008), vol. 74, pages 6348 - 6357 | - RAINEY F.A.; HOLLEN B.J.; SMALL A., Bergey 's Manual of Systematic Microbiology Vol. 3 The Firmicutes, (2009), vol. 3, pages 736 - 827 | - ROUX V.; RAOULT D, INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF SYSTEMATIC AND EVOLUTIONARY MICROBIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 5, pages 1049 - 1054 | - ZANGERL P, DEUTSCHE MILCHWIRTSCHAFT, (1993), vol. 19, pages 936 - 940 |