EP3150068 - SEED TREATMENT COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT, TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2019/41] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISRAELS, Rafel Roonstraße 61 50674 Köln / DE | 02 /
KLAMCZYNSKI, Katharine Forststr. 4 67459 Böhl-Iggelheim / DE | 03 /
BRATZ, Matthias Kurpfalzstr. 41 67133 Maxdorf / DE | 04 /
SCHLOTTERBECK, Ulf Burgstraße 20 68165 Mannheim / DE | 05 /
VOESTE, Dirk Berliner Platz 11 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2019/41] |
Former [2017/14] | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16192502.9 | 14.08.2008 | [2017/14] | Priority number, date | EP20070114462 | 16.08.2007 Original published format: EP 07114462 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3150068 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3150068 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/00, A01N25/04, A01N25/30, A01N43/653, A01N47/02, A01N53/00, A01N47/24, A01P3/00, A01P7/00, A01N43/56, A01N37/44 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
A01N25/00 (EP,US);
A01N25/04 (EP,US);
A01N25/30 (EP,US);
A01N37/44 (US);
A01N43/56 (US);
A01N43/653 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N25/30, A01N43/653, A01N47/02, A01N47/24, A01N53/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/653, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/653, A01N25/00, A01N25/04 (US,EP);
A01N47/02, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N47/02, A01N25/00, A01N25/04 (US,EP);
A01N47/24, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N47/24, A01N25/00, A01N25/04 (US,EP);
A01N53/00, A01N2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/46] |
Former [2017/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SAMENBEHANDLUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND -VERFAHREN | [2017/14] | English: | SEED TREATMENT COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [2017/14] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SEMENCES | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 04.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08803029.1 / EP2180783 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.08.2008 | AT | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | ES | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | IT | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | TR | 09.10.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | NO | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | PT | 10.02.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/18] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 09.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0035284 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 6, paragraph 3 * * example 2a * [Y] 1-16; | [X]US6455471 (GUBELMANN-BONNEAU ISABELLE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 1, lines 4-15 * * column 3, lines 15-17 * * column 5; examples 4-5 *; | [Y]WO2005036963 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * page 1, lines 13-25 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 13 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 13, lines 32-34 * * page 14, lines 17-19 * * examples 1,3,4 *; | [Y]WO2006035316 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-16 * page 3, lines 2-16 * * page 7, lines 16-25 * * page 8, lines 6-20 * * page 9, line 20 - page 10, line 26 * * examples 1-18,24-30,37-42,47,49-53 *; | [Y]WO2007003319 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-16 * page 2, lines 17-25 * * page 3, lines 4-10 * * page 10, line 24 - page 12, line 17 * * examples 1-12 *; | [E]WO2008136917 (TROY TECHNOLOGY CORP INC [US], et al) [E] 1-16 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 2 * * examples 2d,2e,6,7 *; | [E]WO2009021717 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [E] 1-16* page 52 * | by applicant | US3060084 | US3299566 | US3920442 | US4144050 | US4172714 | EP0009169 | EP0009170 | US4245432 | US4272417 | US4339456 | GB2095558 | US4372080 | US4383391 | US4465017 | US4634587 | US4735015 | US4759945 | EP0276464 | US4822779 | WO9113546 | EP0454621 | EP0462456 | US5080925 | US5107787 | US5180587 | US5208030 | US5232701 | US5300127 | US5328942 | US5389399 | EP0707445 | WO9626202 | US5554445 | US5580544 | US5622003 | US5661103 | WO9741116 | WO9741117 | WO9741118 | WO9828279 | WO9828277 | US5791084 | WO9845274 | US5834447 | US5849320 | US5876739 | US5882713 | US5891246 | US5918413 | US5939356 | WO0100614 | US6221890 | WO0170671 | US6335357 | WO0248137 | JP2002193709 | JP2002284608 | WO02089579 | WO02090320 | WO02090321 | WO03007717 | WO03007718 | WO03015518 | WO03024222 | WO2004006677 | WO2004020399 | JP2004099597 | WO2004033468 | WO2004067528 | WO2004080180 | WO2005036963 | WO2005063694 | WO2005068423 | WO2005068432 | WO2005118552 | JP2009010907 | - Farm Chemicals Handbook, MEISTER PUBLISHING COMPANY, (2001), vol. 88 | - PESTICIDE SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 54, pages 237 - 243 | - W.C. GRIFFIN, J. SOC. COSMETIC CHEM., (1954), vol. 5, page 249 | - BROWNING, "Agglomeration", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING, (19671204), pages 147 - 148 | - Perry's Chemical Engineer's Handbook, MCGRAW-HILL, (1963), pages 8 - 57 |