03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
07.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] |
07.06.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] |
31.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
29.06.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
25.06.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.06.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.06.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.05.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.10.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.03.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] |
31.03.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
31.03.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] |
11.10.2016 |
Change - representative |
|