Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10015508 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2018 | B2 | US2017127079 | 04.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015213823 | 30.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017085448 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2017 | A | JP6078138B | 08.02.2017 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015213823 | 30.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3163879 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2018 | B1 | EP3163879 | 03.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2015213823 | 30.10.2015 |