EP3156307 - WORK VEHICLES WITH CYLINDER CUSHIONING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Curnyn, William P 527 N. College Avenue Geneseo, IL 61254 / US | 02 /
Olsen, Henry C 1953 Royal Court Bettendorf, IA 52722 / US | 03 /
Somers, Michael D 1450 Wingate Drive Dubuque, IA 52002 / US | 04 /
Stander, Francois 1854 Hummingbird Drive Dubuque, IA 52002 / US | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Reichert, Christian John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Mannheim Regional Center Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2017/16] | Application number, filing date | 16193342.9 | 11.10.2016 | [2017/16] | Priority number, date | US201514881734 | 13.10.2015 Original published format: US201514881734 | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3156307 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/12, B62D12/00, // F16F9/48, F16F9/49 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
B62D5/12 (EP,US);
B60G17/04 (US);
A01B59/0415 (US);
B60G11/265 (US);
B62D12/00 (EP,US);
F16F9/49 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] |
Former [2017/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARBEITSFAHRZEUGE MIT ZYLINDERDÄMPFUNGSANORDNUNG | [2017/16] | English: | WORK VEHICLES WITH CYLINDER CUSHIONING ARRANGEMENT | [2017/16] | French: | VÉHICULES DE CHANTIER AVEC SYSTÈME D'AMORTISSEMENT DE CYLINDRE | [2017/16] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 06.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 04.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 03.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 04.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3238850 (YVES DESMARCHELIER) [A] 9-11 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 26; figures 1-5 *; | [XI]GB1377726 (VOLVO BM) [X] 1-8 * page 1, line 41 - page 2, line 25; figure 1; claims 1,2 * [I] 9-11; | [A]JPS5993538 (SUMITOMO PRECISION PROD CO, et al) [A] 8-11* the whole document *; | [A]FR2547872 (POCLAIN SA [FR]) [A] 9-11 * Abstract; page 7, line 18 - page 8, line 8; figures 1-2; claim 1 *; | [XA]US6382075 (CHIARAMONTE MICHAEL P [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 66 - column 4, line 13; figures 1-2 * [A] 2-11; | [A]EP2657541 (PARKER HANNIFIN MFG GERMANY GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 9-11 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-4 * |