EP3183992 - SKIN TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurter Str. 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mehaddene, Tarik Am Tiefen Born 4 61184 Karben / DE | 02 /
Grieshaber, Frieder Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 03 /
Kraus, Bernhard Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 04 /
Klemm, Torsten Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/32] | Schneider, Stefan Michael, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2017/26] | Schneider, Stefan Michael, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patentabteilung Frankfurterstrasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 16193384.1 | 11.10.2016 | [2017/26] | Priority number, date | EP20150202029 | 22.12.2015 Original published format: EP 15202029 | [2017/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3183992 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3183992 | Date: | 07.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A45D26/00 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
A45D26/0023 (EP,US);
A45D26/0028 (EP,US);
A45D26/0038 (EP,US);
A45D2026/008 (EP,US);
A45D2026/0085 (EP,US);
A61H15/0078 (EP,US);
A61H2015/0035 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0153 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0184 (EP,US);
A61H2201/10 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1207 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1463 (EP,US);
A61H2201/50 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5058 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5061 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] |
Former [2017/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HAUTBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/26] | English: | SKIN TREATMENT APPARATUS | [2017/26] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE LA PEAU | [2017/26] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.10.2016 | AL | 07.08.2019 | AT | 07.08.2019 | CY | 07.08.2019 | CZ | 07.08.2019 | DK | 07.08.2019 | EE | 07.08.2019 | FI | 07.08.2019 | HR | 07.08.2019 | IT | 07.08.2019 | LT | 07.08.2019 | LV | 07.08.2019 | MC | 07.08.2019 | MK | 07.08.2019 | MT | 07.08.2019 | PL | 07.08.2019 | RO | 07.08.2019 | RS | 07.08.2019 | SE | 07.08.2019 | SI | 07.08.2019 | SK | 07.08.2019 | SM | 07.08.2019 | TR | 07.08.2019 | IE | 11.10.2019 | LU | 11.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | BG | 07.11.2019 | NO | 07.11.2019 | GR | 08.11.2019 | IS | 07.12.2019 | PT | 09.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 11.10.2016 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
MT | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 11.10.2019 | ||
LU | 11.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.10.2016 | |
AL | 07.08.2019 | ||
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 11.10.2019 | ||
LU | 11.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CY | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 11.10.2019 | ||
LU | 11.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IE | 11.10.2019 | ||
LU | 11.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SI | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 11.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 11.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 11.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
MC | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
SM | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
SK | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
AT | 07.08.2019 | ||
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
IT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
PL | 07.08.2019 | ||
RO | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
DK | 07.08.2019 | ||
EE | 07.08.2019 | ||
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
TR | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 07.08.2019 | |
FI | 07.08.2019 | ||
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
HR | 07.08.2019 | ||
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
LV | 07.08.2019 | ||
RS | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
GR | 08.11.2019 | ||
IS | 07.12.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
SE | 07.08.2019 | ||
BG | 07.11.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
PT | 09.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 07.08.2019 | |
LT | 07.08.2019 | ||
NO | 07.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 07.08.2019 | |
NO | 07.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]JP2001128728 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [XAI]US2005142093 (SKOVER GREGORY [US], et al) | Examination | EP2550935 | by applicant | JP2001128728 | WO2005092142 | EP1962633 | WO2010066966 | WO2014024084 |