EP3156628 - CONTROLLING INJECTION OF BIO-DIESEL INTO A GAS TURBINE COMBUSTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VARILLAS, Gerardo F 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 02 /
SHARMA, Rohit Mohinder John F Welch Technology Centre, Plot 122 Hoodi Village, Whitefield Road 560066 Bangalore / IN | 03 /
EPLEY, Richard 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | 04 /
ZHENG, Sheng Jia 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Pöpper, Evamaria General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 16193420.3 | 12.10.2016 | [2017/16] | Priority number, date | US201514884346 | 15.10.2015 Original published format: US201514884346 | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3156628 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F02C3/20, F02C7/22, F02C3/24 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
F02C3/24 (EP,US);
F02C7/224 (US);
F02C3/04 (US);
F02C6/00 (US);
F02C7/22 (EP,US);
H04Q11/00 (US);
H04Q2213/001 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] |
Former [2017/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG DER EINSPRITZUNG VON BIODIESEL IN EINE GASTURBINENBRENNKAMMER | [2017/16] | English: | CONTROLLING INJECTION OF BIO-DIESEL INTO A GAS TURBINE COMBUSTOR | [2017/16] | French: | COMMANDE D'INJECTION D'AGROCARBURANT DANS UNE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION DE TURBINE À GAZ | [2017/16] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 30.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 12.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011024191 (FAT BIOFULES TECHNOLOGY PRIVATE LTD [IN]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0057]; figure 6 *; | [A]DE102012209566 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0041]; figures 2-5 *; | [A]EP2716890 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0027]; figures 3-5 *; | [XI]US2015119611 (BALL DAVID WESLEY [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0026]; figures 2-3 * [I] 5,12,13 |