EP3156859 - A SYSTEM FOR DYNAMIC CONTROL WITH INTERACTIVE VISUALIZATION TO OPTIMIZE ENERGY CONSUMPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2017/16] | Application number, filing date | 16193602.6 | 12.10.2016 | [2017/16] | Priority number, date | US201514883521 | 14.10.2015 Original published format: US201514883521 | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3156859 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05B15/02, G06Q50/06 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
G05F1/66 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (EP,CN,US);
G05B13/041 (US);
G05B19/418 (CN);
G06Q50/06 (EP,US);
G05B2219/2639 (EP,US);
G05B2219/2642 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR DYNAMISCHEN STEUERUNG MIT INTERAKTIVER VISUALISIERUNG ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DES ENERGIEVERBRAUCHS | [2017/16] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR DYNAMIC CONTROL WITH INTERACTIVE VISUALIZATION TO OPTIMIZE ENERGY CONSUMPTION | [2017/16] | French: | SYSTÈME CONTRÔLE DYNAMIQUE À VISUALISATION INTERACTIVE PERMETTANT D'OPTIMISER LA CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE | [2017/16] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 12.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 18.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004158541 (NOTARIANNI JOSEPH C [US], et al) [A] 4 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0025] *; | [A]EP2292986 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 4 * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0111] * * figures 1,19 *; | [I]US2012280827 (KASHIWAGI AKIFUMI [JP], et al) [I] 1,10 * figures 1,3,5,9,10 * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0102] *; | [A]JP2014082811 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 4 * paragraph [0024]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0090] *; | [XI]US2014180968 (SONG KWAN-WOO [KR], et al) [X] 1,10-12,14,15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010]; figures 1,2,3,4,10-18 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0124] * * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0137] * [I] 2-9,13; | [XI]US2014222230 (SHIMIZU NORIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,10,11 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1,5 * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0100] * [I] 2,4,5,7,13,15; | [A]US2015127181 (SAKO YOICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 4* paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0071] * |