EP3159844 - SCALABLE SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING AND SERVING RECOMMENDATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Demandware, Inc. 5 Wall Street Burligton, MA 01803 / US | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krishnan, Bharath K c/o Demandware Inc. 5 Wall Street Burlington, MA Massachusetts 01803 / US | 02 /
Torra, Michael J c/o Demandware Inc. 5 Wall Street Burlington, MA Massachusetts 01803 / US | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/17] | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16194216.4 | 17.10.2016 | [2017/17] | Priority number, date | US201514886826 | 19.10.2015 Original published format: US201514886826 | [2017/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3159844 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0631 (EP,US);
G06F16/24575 (EP,US);
G06F9/5072 (US);
G06Q30/0253 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0255 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0261 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] |
Former [2017/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SKALIERBARE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG UND BEREITSTELLUNG VON EMPFEHLUNGEN | [2017/17] | English: | SCALABLE SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING AND SERVING RECOMMENDATIONS | [2017/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES ÉVOLUTIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE GÉNÉRATION ET DESSERTE DE RECOMMANDATIONS | [2017/17] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 16.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 08.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Andre Fatala ET AL, "Using AWS to Build a Graph-based Product Recommendation System", (20131114), URL: www.slideshare.net/AmazonWebServices/using-aws-to-build-a-graphbased-product-recommendation-system-bdt303-aws-reinvent-2013, (20170113), XP055335251 [I] 1-16 * pages 1, 80 * | [I] - Josh Padnick, "A Comprehensive Guide to Building a Scalable Web App on Amazon Web Services - Part 1", (20150131), URL: https://www.airpair.com/aws/posts/building-a-scalable-web-app-on-amazon-web-services-p1, (20170112), XP055334749 [I] 1-16 * sections 2.5.1, 4.1.2 and 4.2 * | [I] - Accenture, "Building a Recommender with Apache Mahout on Amazon Elastic MapReduce (EMR) | AWS Big Data Blog", (20140716), URL: https://aws.amazon.com/blogs/big-data/building-a-recommender-with-apache-mahout-on-amazon-elastic-mapreduce-emr/, (20170113), XP055335268 [I] 1-16 * the whole document * |