EP3163238 - DRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fliegl jun., Josef Hart 5c 84453 Mühldorf am Inn / DE | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Michael, et al Tetzner & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Tetzner, Michael, et al TETZNER & PARTNER mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16194508.4 | 19.10.2016 | [2017/18] | Priority number, date | DE201520105780U | 30.10.2015 Original published format: DE 202015105780 U | [2017/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3163238 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F26B11/04, F26B17/00 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
F26B11/0409 (EP,US);
F26B11/04 (EP,RU,US);
F26B11/0472 (EP,US);
F26B11/0486 (EP,US);
F26B17/00 (EP,US);
F26B17/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/47] |
Former [2017/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TROCKNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/18] | English: | DRIER | [2017/18] | French: | SÉCHEUR | [2017/18] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/47] | 28.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/13] | 04.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE3820006 (VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document * [I] 3,6-12; | [A]EP2096394 (MAJAST BVBA [BE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE513280 (BERNHARD SAEGEBARTH) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE438728 (JOHANNES PRESS) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2397239 (VIL CHEK SERGEI YUR EVICH [RU]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]BE418608 (PROCÉDÉS ET PRODUITS CHIMIQUES S.A. [FR]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE202009018720U |