Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10809132 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2020 | B2 | US2018106681 | 19.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16194690 | 19.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107966211B | Global Dossier | 30.04.2021 | B | CN107966211 | 27.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | EP16194690 | 19.10.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3312579 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2022 | B1 | EP3312579 | 25.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16194690 | 19.10.2016 |