Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202015009576U | 14.05.2018 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202015009576 | 23.10.2015 | DE102015220743 | 23.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11027581 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2021 | B2 | US2017113497 | 27.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015220743 | 23.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3159191 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2018 | B1 | EP3159191 | 26.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015220743 | 23.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102015220743 | 27.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015220743 | 23.10.2015 |