EP3139615 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DECODING/ENCODING A VIDEO SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [2017/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEON, Byeong-Moon 306-1005 Hyundai 3-cha Apt. Gwangjang-dong Gwangjin-gu 143-754 Seoul / KR | 02 /
PARK, Seung Wook 1429-7 Sillim 5-dong Gwanak-gu 151-891 Seoul / KR | 03 /
KOO, Han Suh 108-8, Nonhyun-dong Gangnam-gu 135-101 Seoul / KR | 04 /
JEON, Yong Joon B-1405, Royal Palace Houseville, Sunae-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si 463-020 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
PARK, Ji Ho 53-502 Gu Hyundai Apt. Apgujeong 1-dong Gangnam-gu 135-903 Seoul / KR | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Diehl & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 9 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16194818.7 | 30.03.2007 | [2017/10] | Priority number, date | US20060787171P | 30.03.2006 Original published format: US 787171 P | US20060801398P | 19.05.2006 Original published format: US 801398 P | US20060810642P | 05.06.2006 Original published format: US 810642 P | US20060830601P | 14.07.2006 Original published format: US 830601 P | US20060832153P | 21.07.2006 Original published format: US 832153 P | US20060837925P | 16.08.2006 Original published format: US 837925 P | US20060840032P | 25.08.2006 Original published format: US 840032 P | US20060842152P | 05.09.2006 Original published format: US 842152 P | [2017/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3139615 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/597, H04N19/70, H04N19/50, H04N19/573 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
H04N19/573 (EP,US);
H04N19/105 (KR);
H04N19/50 (EP,US);
H04N19/51 (KR);
H04N19/597 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/42] |
Former [2017/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DECODIEREN/CODIEREN EINES VIDEOSIGNALS | [2017/10] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DECODING/ENCODING A VIDEO SIGNAL | [2017/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉCODAGE/CODAGE D'UN SIGNAL VIDÉO | [2017/10] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 09.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/11] | 19.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2018/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07745743.0 / EP2008460 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - "Working Draft 2 of ISO/IEC 14496-10:2005/Amd.4 Multiview Video Coding", 79. MPEG MEETING;15-1-2007 - 19-1-2007; MARRAKECH; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20070212), no. N8753, ISSN 0000-0060, XP030015247 [XP] 1-10 * the whole document * | [AP] - CHEN Y ET AL, "MVC reference picture management", 21. JVT MEETING; 78. MPEG MEETING; 20-10-2006 - 27-10-2006; HANGZHOU,CN; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20061022), no. JVT-U105, ISSN 0000-0407, XP030006751 [AP] 1-10 * pages 7-8 * | [AP] - CHEN Y ET AL, "MVC reference picture list construction", 22. JVT MEETING; 79. MPEG MEETING; 13-01-2007 - 20-01-2007; MARRAKECH,MA; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20070110), no. JVT-V043, ISSN 0000-0156, XP030006851 [AP] 1-10 * the whole document * |