EP3151443 - DATA SUPPLYING APPARATUS, DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS AND DATA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIROSE, Takatoshi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2017/14] | Application number, filing date | 16195008.4 | 02.06.2009 | [2017/14] | Priority number, date | JP20080171243 | 30.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008171243 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3151443 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/59, H04B5/02, H04N5/765, H04W76/02, H04W84/10, H04N1/00, H04L12/24, // H04N5/775, H04L12/26 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
H04L43/0811 (EP,CN,US);
H04B5/72 (US);
H04B5/22 (EP);
H04N1/00129 (EP,CN,US);
H04N1/00347 (EP,CN,US);
H04N1/32765 (EP,CN,US);
H04N1/32786 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/43637 (EP,CN,US);
H04N5/775 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
H04W76/19 (EP,US);
H04W76/20 (EP,US);
H04N2101/00 (EP,CN,US);
H04N2201/0036 (EP,CN,US);
H04N2201/0041 (EP,CN,US);
H04N2201/0055 (EP,CN,US);
H04N2201/0058 (EP,CN,US);
H04N2201/0084 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/46] |
Former [2017/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DATENAUSGABEVORRICHTUNG, DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DATENKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2017/14] | English: | DATA SUPPLYING APPARATUS, DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS AND DATA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2017/14] | French: | APPAREIL DE FOURNITURE DE DONNÉES, APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 09.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09773266.3 / EP2294702 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2000209653 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [I]US2004063459 (YAMASHITA NAOYA [JP], et al); | [I]WO2007112787 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) | by applicant | JP2005223518 | JP2008171243 |