Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016251345 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615063821 | 08.03.2016 | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | US201113202166 | 18.08.2011 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9321758 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2016 | B2 | US2011306634 | 15.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101868412B | Global Dossier | 18.06.2018 | B1 | KR20170026660 | 08.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101713066B | Global Dossier | 07.03.2017 | B1 | KR20110123273 | 14.11.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5711672B | Global Dossier | 07.05.2015 | B2 | JP2012519158 | 23.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2401272 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2017 | B1 | EP2401272 | 04.01.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | EP10706539 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102356080B | Global Dossier | 29.04.2015 | B | CN102356080 | 15.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2898529 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2017 | C | CA2898529 | 02.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | CA2753667 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2753667 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2015 | C | CA2753667 | 02.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010219160B | Global Dossier | 10.12.2015 | B2 | AU2010219160 | 25.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3150596 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | EP10706539 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI1008918 | 15.03.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1119121T | 14.02.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | EP10706539 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2401272T | 27.02.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2616603T | 13.06.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1166315 | 26.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20170214T | 07.04.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | EP10706539 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2401272T | 27.03.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX340792 | 25.07.2016 | B | MX2011008999 | 26.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ594403 | 26.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2401272T | 30.06.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | EP10706539 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2536868 | 27.12.2014 | C2 | RU2011139325 | 10.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG173772 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2401272T | 26.04.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | EP10706539 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT201700121B | 08.03.2017 | B | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201106303 | 27.02.2013 | B | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | WO2010EP01197 | 26.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010097229 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2010 | A3 | WO2010097229 | 02.09.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6214584B | Global Dossier | 18.10.2017 | B2 | JP2015143240 | 06.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104478868 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1208464 | 04.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE031738T | 28.07.2017 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2401272T | 28.02.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG2014008981 | 28.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP09153964 | 27.02.2009 | Type | Earlier application | EP2401272 |