EP3150596 - AMORPHOUS SALT OF A MACROCYCLIC INHIBITOR OF HCV [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1125 Trenton-Harbourton Road Titusville, NJ 08560 / US | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN REMOORTERE, Peter Jozef Maria 44 Western Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 02 /
VANDECRUYS, Roger Petrus Gerebern Langstraat 108 2260 Westerlo / BE | 03 /
de Kock, Herman Augustinus Wolfseind 10 2370 Arendonk / BE | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Purewal, Savroop Janssen Pharmaceutica NV J&J Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2017/14] | Application number, filing date | 16195560.4 | 26.02.2010 | [2017/14] | Priority number, date | EP20090153964 | 27.02.2009 Original published format: EP 09153964 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3150596 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/04, C07D417/14, A61K9/14, A61K31/47, A61K31/4725, A61P31/14 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
C07D417/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4709 (KR);
A61K9/14 (US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] |
Former [2017/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AMORPHES SALZ EINES MACROCYCLISCHEN HCV INHIBITORS | [2017/14] | English: | AMORPHOUS SALT OF A MACROCYCLIC INHIBITOR OF HCV | [2017/14] | French: | SEL AMORPHE D'UN INHIBITEUR MACROCYCLIQUE DU HCV | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 11.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/02] | 02.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10706539.3 / EP2401272 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.01.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 11.01.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007014926 (TIBOTEC PHARM LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1 * amended claims 11, 12, 18-24; page 11, lines 19-25; example 5 *; | [A]WO2008092954 (TIBOTEC PHARM LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 18-27; example 4; claims 1, 15, 16, 25, 26 *; | [A] - GOULD P L ED - TOBYN MIKE ET AL, "SALT SELECTION FOR BASIC DRUGS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19860101), vol. 33, no. 1/03, doi:10.1016/0378-5173(86)90055-4, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 201 - 217, XP002074725 [A] 1 * table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(86)90055-4 | [A] - BERGE S M ET AL, "PHARMACEUTICALS SALTS", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON, US, (19770101), vol. 66, no. 1, doi:10.1002/JPS.2600660104, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 1 - 19, XP000562636 [A] 1 * table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | by applicant | WO2005073216 | WO2007014926 |