Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3200185 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3200185



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 386
28.06.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
21.06.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Search / examination 1
23.05.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
03.05.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.04.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 12
13.03.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
25.10.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.10.2017 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 20
07.08.2017 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.07.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 8
05.07.2017 European search report Search / examination 3
05.07.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
05.07.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.06.2017 Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application Search / examination 3
27.04.2017 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 4
10.04.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.04.2017 Invitation to indicate the subject-matter to be searched Search / examination 2
16.03.2017 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
24.01.2017 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
19.01.2017 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
09.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.01.2017 Annex Search / examination 5
09.01.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
09.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.01.2017 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.01.2017 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.12.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2016 Invitation to file claims Search / examination 1
26.10.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.10.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
26.10.2016 Description Search / examination 77
26.10.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
26.10.2016 Drawings Search / examination 32
26.10.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
26.11.2012 Priority document Search / examination 171