EP3163195 - HUMIDIFICATION AND AIR CLEANING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Kunyoung LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kim, Taeyoon LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 03 /
Lee, Jongsu LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 04 /
Lee, Jungwoo LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 05 /
Lee, Younggu LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 06 /
Choi, Jieun LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 07 /
Kwon, Hyuckju LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 08 /
Son, Sanghyuk LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 09 /
Lee, Kyoungho LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | 10 /
Jeong, Unchang LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon-gu 08592 Seoul / KR | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2017/18] | Application number, filing date | 16196467.1 | 28.10.2016 | [2017/18] | Priority number, date | US201562248463P | 30.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248463 P | KR20150156254 | 07.11.2015 Original published format: KR 20150156254 | KR20150185857 | 24.12.2015 Original published format: KR 20150185857 | KR20160037235 | 28.03.2016 Original published format: KR 20160037235 | US201662355118P | 27.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662355118 P | KR20160083053 | 30.06.2016 Original published format: KR 20160083053 | KR20160129314 | 06.10.2016 Original published format: KR 20160129314 | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3163195 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3163195 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F24F6/14, F24F6/16, F24F6/00, F24F11/00 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
F24F6/16 (EP,US);
F24F6/04 (US);
B01D46/10 (US);
B01F23/21311 (US);
B01F23/21312 (US);
F24F13/20 (US);
F24F13/28 (US);
B01D2279/50 (US);
F24F2006/008 (EP,US);
F24F2006/046 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] |
Former [2017/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BEFEUCHTUNGS- UND LUFTREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/18] | English: | HUMIDIFICATION AND AIR CLEANING APPARATUS | [2017/18] | French: | APPAREIL DE PURIFICATION ET D'HUMIDIFICATION DE L'AIR | [2017/18] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 19.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2016 | AL | 02.12.2020 | AT | 02.12.2020 | CY | 02.12.2020 | CZ | 02.12.2020 | DK | 02.12.2020 | EE | 02.12.2020 | ES | 02.12.2020 | FI | 02.12.2020 | HR | 02.12.2020 | IT | 02.12.2020 | LT | 02.12.2020 | LV | 02.12.2020 | MC | 02.12.2020 | MK | 02.12.2020 | MT | 02.12.2020 | NL | 02.12.2020 | PL | 02.12.2020 | RO | 02.12.2020 | RS | 02.12.2020 | SE | 02.12.2020 | SI | 02.12.2020 | SK | 02.12.2020 | SM | 02.12.2020 | BG | 02.03.2021 | NO | 02.03.2021 | GR | 03.03.2021 | IS | 02.04.2021 | PT | 05.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.10.2016 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
MK | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 28.10.2016 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CY | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 28.10.2016 | |
AL | 02.12.2020 | ||
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
MC | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
ES | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
DK | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SI | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
IT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 02.12.2020 | |
AT | 02.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IS | 02.04.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 02.12.2020 | |
CZ | 02.12.2020 | ||
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
EE | 02.12.2020 | ||
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RO | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SK | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 02.12.2020 | |
FI | 02.12.2020 | ||
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LT | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
PT | 05.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
SM | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
NL | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
HR | 02.12.2020 | ||
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
PL | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
LV | 02.12.2020 | ||
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
SE | 02.12.2020 | ||
BG | 02.03.2021 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
GR | 03.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 02.12.2020 | |
RS | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 02.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4749389 (WOERWAG PETER [CH]) [A] 1,5* page 3, line 1 - page 7, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH11347095 (TOTO LTD) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2003307327 (RABI KK) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XI]JP2014156968 (CORONA CORP) [X] 1,8,11,12 * the whole document * [I] 2-7,9,10,13-15; | [XI]JP2015052399 (CORONA CORP) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-15; | [XI]JP2015143582 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-15 |