EP3187690 - SYSTEM FOR AN INLET GUIDE VANE SHROUD AND BAFFLE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2017/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOBOCKI, Marcin Jacek Aleja Krakowska 110/114 02-256 PL Warsaw / PL | 02 /
WARDECKI, Wiktor Karol Aleja Krakowska 110/114 02-256 PL Warsaw / PL | 03 /
KULESA, Joseph Charles 6390 Tyler's Crossing West Chester, OH 45069 US / US | 04 /
STASZEWSKI, Maciej Aleja Krakowska 110/114 02-256 PL Warsaw / PL | [2017/27] | Representative(s) | Williams, Andrew Richard GE International Inc. GPO-Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2017/27] | Application number, filing date | 16196832.6 | 02.11.2016 | [2017/27] | Priority number, date | PL20160415534 | 04.01.2016 Original published format: PL 41553416 | [2017/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3187690 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, F01D11/00, F01D11/08 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
F01D11/001 (EP);
F01D25/24 (CN);
F04D29/542 (US);
F01D11/00 (US);
F01D11/08 (US);
F01D17/162 (EP);
F01D25/246 (EP);
F01D5/082 (EP);
F01D9/04 (US);
F01D9/041 (CN);
F02C3/04 (US);
F02C7/04 (US);
F04D29/083 (US);
F04D29/325 (US);
F05D2220/32 (CN,US);
F05D2240/126 (EP,US);
F05D2240/14 (CN);
F05D2240/35 (US);
F05D2240/80 (EP);
F05D2250/712 (US);
F05D2260/201 (EP,US);
F05D2260/31 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR EINE EINTRITTSLEITSCHAUFELDECKBAND- UND DEFLEKTORANORDNUNG | [2017/27] | English: | SYSTEM FOR AN INLET GUIDE VANE SHROUD AND BAFFLE ASSEMBLY | [2017/27] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR CARÉNAGE DÉFLECTEUR DE GUIDE D'ADMISSION ET ENSEMBLE CHICANE | [2017/27] | Examination procedure | 06.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/30] | 26.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2863634 (DOUGLAS CHAMBERLIN REGINALD HE) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [I] 2-15; | [X]US4087199 (HEMSWORTH MARTIN C, et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [XI]EP0018892 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-15; | [I]GB2239678 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [I] 5,11* figure 3 * |