EP3319179 - METHOD FOR ELECTRICALLY CONNECTING ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT IN A KITCHEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 5H AG Schwendistrasse 12 9032 Engelburg / CH | [2021/11] |
Former [2018/19] | For all designated states HPH Hardegger AG Tannenbergstrasse 5 9032 Engelburg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hardegger, Hanspeter Tannenbergstrasse 5 9032 Engelburg / CH | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2018/19] | Application number, filing date | 16197059.5 | 03.11.2016 | [2018/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3319179 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/61, H01R12/59, A47B77/02, H01R13/52 | [2018/19] | CPC: |
H01R12/613 (EP);
A47B77/02 (EP);
H01R12/594 (EP);
H01R13/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] |
Former [2018/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ELEKTRISCHEN ANSCHLIESSEN VON ELEKTRISCHEN GERÄTEN IN EINER KÜCHE | [2018/19] | English: | METHOD FOR ELECTRICALLY CONNECTING ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT IN A KITCHEN | [2018/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RACCORDEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE D'APPAREILS ÉLECTRIQUES DANS UNE CUISINE | [2018/19] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/49] | 24.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2264216 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [Y]EP0331647 (SALVARANI IND SPA [IT]); | [Y]EP0665608 (DAEWYLER AG KABEL UND SYSTEME [CH], et al); | [A]EP1230875 (UNION KNOPF GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP2280454 (ABB BV [NL], et al); | [A]EP2375526 (WOERTZ AG [CH]) | by applicant | DE9411436U | EP1391967 | EP2011703 | EP2315217 | EP2768082 | EP2928025 |