EP3181566 - IMIDAZOTRIAZINONE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 301 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIPKA, Amy 1446 Main Street Reading, MA 01867 / US | 02 /
SHAPIRO, Gideon 5507 NW 80th Avenue Gainesville, FL 32653 / US | 03 /
CHESWORTH, Richard 584 Strawberry Hill Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | 04 /
KOENIG, Gerhard 1662 Commonwealth Avenue Newton, MA 02465 / US | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | HGF 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16197573.5 | 20.09.2011 | [2017/25] | Priority number, date | US20100384694P | 20.09.2010 Original published format: US 384694 P | [2017/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3181566 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61P25/00, A61K31/53 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D519/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] |
Former [2017/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | IMIDAZOTRIAZINONVERBINDUNGEN | [2017/25] | English: | IMIDAZOTRIAZINONE COMPOUNDS | [2017/25] | French: | COMPOSES IMIDAZOTRIAZINONES | [2017/25] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 04.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11761793.6 / EP2619208 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03037432 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 2, 10 *; | [A]WO2004096811 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1, 8 *; | [IA]WO2008139293 (PFIZER [US], et al) [I] 1,3-5,7-11 * claims 1, 10-12 * * example - * [A] 2,6; | [A] - WERMUTH C G, "MOLECULAR VARIATIONS BASED ON ISOSTERIC REPLACEMENTS", PRACTICE OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, XX, XX, (1996), pages 203 - 237, XP002190259 [A] 1-11 * part II.D. * | by applicant | EP0039051 | WO2004078163 | - FISHER ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 273, no. 25, pages 15559 - 15564 | - VAN DER STAAY ET AL., NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (2008), vol. 55, no. 5, pages 908 - 918 | - HUTTSON ET AL., NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (2011), vol. 61, no. 4, pages 665 - 676 | - Handbook of Pharmaceutical Salts, Properties, Selection and Use, WILEY-VCH | - BUNDGAARD, J. MED. CHEM., (1989), page 2503 | - LAZORTHES ET AL., ADVANCES IN DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS AND APPLICATIONS IN NEUROSURGERY, pages 143 - 192 | - OMAYA ET AL., CANCER DRUG DELIVERY, vol. 1, pages 169 - 179 | - MINTO, J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1997), vol. 281, pages 93 - 102 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MAACK PUBLISHING CO |