EP3165150 - ENDOSCOPE AND HARDNESS ADJUSTMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2019/39] |
Former [2017/19] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASAOKA, Takuro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa, 258-8538 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Yoshihiro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa, 258-8538 / JP | [2017/19] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2019/39] |
Former [2017/19] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16197599.0 | 07.11.2016 | [2017/19] | Priority number, date | JP20150219209 | 09.11.2015 Original published format: JP 2015219209 | [2017/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3165150 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3165150 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/005 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
A61B1/0057 (EP,US);
A61B1/0052 (US);
A61B1/0055 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] |
Former [2017/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ENDOSKOP UND HÄRTEANPASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/19] | English: | ENDOSCOPE AND HARDNESS ADJUSTMENT DEVICE | [2017/19] | French: | ENDOSCOPE ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE DE DURETÉ | [2017/19] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2016 | AL | 25.09.2019 | AT | 25.09.2019 | CY | 25.09.2019 | CZ | 25.09.2019 | DK | 25.09.2019 | EE | 25.09.2019 | ES | 25.09.2019 | FI | 25.09.2019 | HR | 25.09.2019 | IT | 25.09.2019 | LT | 25.09.2019 | LV | 25.09.2019 | MC | 25.09.2019 | MK | 25.09.2019 | MT | 25.09.2019 | NL | 25.09.2019 | PL | 25.09.2019 | RO | 25.09.2019 | RS | 25.09.2019 | SE | 25.09.2019 | SI | 25.09.2019 | SK | 25.09.2019 | SM | 25.09.2019 | TR | 25.09.2019 | IE | 07.11.2019 | LU | 07.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | BG | 25.12.2019 | NO | 25.12.2019 | GR | 26.12.2019 | IS | 26.01.2020 | PT | 27.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 07.11.2016 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
MT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
TR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IE | 07.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 07.11.2016 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
MT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
IE | 07.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 07.11.2016 | |
AL | 25.09.2019 | ||
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
IE | 07.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CY | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
IE | 07.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SI | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
IE | 07.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
IE | 07.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
DK | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
MC | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 07.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
SM | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
SK | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
AT | 25.09.2019 | ||
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
ES | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
IT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
PL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RO | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 25.09.2019 | |
EE | 25.09.2019 | ||
FI | 25.09.2019 | ||
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
PT | 27.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
NL | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
HR | 25.09.2019 | ||
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
LV | 25.09.2019 | ||
RS | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
GR | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
SE | 25.09.2019 | ||
BG | 25.12.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 25.09.2019 | |
LT | 25.09.2019 | ||
NO | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 25.09.2019 | |
NO | 25.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6203494 (MORIYAMA HIROKI [JP]) [Y] 4,6 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 45 - column 11, line 18 *; | [XDY]JP2002253476 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [XD] 1-3,5,7-9 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0061] * [Y] 4,6; | [Y]JP3614986B (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [Y] 4,6 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0045] *; | [AP]JP2016067529 (FUJIFILM CORP) [AP] 1-9* the whole document * | by applicant | JPS4965086 | JP2002253476 |