EP3168861 - ASSEMBLY FOR UV IRRADIATION OF OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IST METZ GmbH Lauterstrasse 18 72622 Nürtingen / DE | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUCHS, Günter Badstraße 5 73252 Unterlenningen / DE | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Pfiz, Thomas, et al Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB Tübinger Strasse 26 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/20] | Application number, filing date | 16198468.7 | 11.11.2016 | [2017/20] | Priority number, date | DE201510222459 | 13.11.2015 Original published format: DE102015222459 | [2017/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3168861 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/52, B41F23/04, // F21V29/503 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
H01J61/52 (EP);
B41F23/0409 (EP);
H01J61/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTRAHLUNGSAGGREGAT ZUR UV-BESTRAHLUNG VON OBJEKTEN | [2017/20] | English: | ASSEMBLY FOR UV IRRADIATION OF OBJECTS | [2017/20] | French: | ORGANE DE RAYONNEMENT POUR RADIATION UV D'OBJETS | [2017/20] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 12.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102008058056 (MECHATRONICS GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-12 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0025] - [0032] - [0039] , [0040]; figures 1,2,6 * [I] 3,13,14; | [A]CA2383813 (LUMPP & CONSULTANTS [FR]) [A] 1,7 * page 10, line 23 - page 13, line 34; figure 1 *; | [A]US5489819 (SAKAI MOTOHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 13,14 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 26 *; | [XI]JP2014042884 (GS YUASA CORP) [X] 1,4,5,8-12 * paragraphs [0024] - [0038] - [0051] - [0055]; figures 2,4,7 * [I] 13,14; | [A]JPH04132940U (IWASAKI ELECTRIC CO.) [A] 1,2,4,5,7-14 * figures 1, 2, 5-7 *; | [A]US2014245628 (RAE MALCOLM [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,4-14 * paragraphs [0036] - [0045]; figures 1,2,4,5 * |