08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
08.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
13.08.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
25.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
10.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
04.09.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] |
02.09.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.09.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.09.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.05.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.11.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.04.2019 |
Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.12.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
23.11.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
23.11.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
20.11.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.04.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] |
14.11.2016 |
Change - representative |
|