EP3323454 - PORTABLE MESH NEBULIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huang, Yu-Kang 15F., No. 188, Fuhuiyuan Blvd. Xitun Dist. Taichung City / TW | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | Horak, Michael Horak. Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Georgstraße 48 30159 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | Horak, Michael Horak Rechtsanwälte Georgstrasse 48 30159 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 16199019.7 | 16.11.2016 | [2018/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3323454 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M11/00, A61M15/00, B05B17/00 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
A61M11/005 (EP);
B05B17/0653 (EP);
A61M15/0085 (EP);
A61M2205/8206 (EP);
A61M2205/8237 (EP);
A61M2205/8262 (EP);
B05B17/0646 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARER GITTERZERSTÄUBER | [2018/21] | English: | PORTABLE MESH NEBULIZER | [2018/21] | French: | NÉBULISEUR PORTATIF À MAILLES | [2018/21] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2016 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 16.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/49] | 16.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2015128375 (PARI PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-3 * page 17 - paragraph second last *[Y] 4,5; | [IY]US2016206835 (LEE KUO-LIANG [TW], et al) [I] 1-3 * paragraph [0013]; figures 1,2,5 * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0040] * [Y] 4,5 |