EP3173286 - TRANSPORT VEHICLE FOR PIECE GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fliegl Agrartechnik GmbH Bürgermeister-Boch-Straße 1 84453 Mühldorf am Inn / DE | [2017/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLIEGL, Josef, sen. Maierhof 1 84556 Kastl / DE | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Nußbaum, Christopher Patentanwaltskanzlei Nussbaum Lessingstraße 4 84561 Mehring / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/22] | Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16199147.6 | 16.11.2016 | [2017/22] | Priority number, date | DE201520106266U | 18.11.2015 Original published format: DE 202015106266 U | [2017/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3173286 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3173286 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/26 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
A01D90/083 (EP);
B60P1/00 (RU);
B60P1/26 (EP);
B60P3/00 (RU);
B60P7/00 (RU);
B62D33/027 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] |
Former [2017/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRANSPORTFAHRZEUG FÜR STÜCKGUT | [2017/22] | English: | TRANSPORT VEHICLE FOR PIECE GOODS | [2017/22] | French: | VÉHICULE DE TRANSPORT POUR MATÉRIAUX EN VRAC | [2017/22] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 25.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | ES | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | HR | 26.09.2018 | IT | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | LV | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MK | 26.09.2018 | MT | 26.09.2018 | NL | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | RS | 26.09.2018 | SE | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | SM | 26.09.2018 | TR | 26.09.2018 | IE | 16.11.2018 | LU | 16.11.2018 | FR | 26.11.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | NO | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | IS | 26.01.2019 | PT | 26.01.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/29] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.11.2018 | ||
FR | 26.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.11.2018 | ||
FR | 26.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.11.2018 | ||
FR | 26.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.11.2018 | ||
FR | 26.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
IE | 16.11.2018 | ||
LU | 16.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 16.11.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1630865 (NIEDEROESTERR MOLKEREI) [A] 2 * figure 4 *; | [A]DE2538079 (FAHR AG MASCHF) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE2901597 (KRONE BERNHARD GMBH MASCHF) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE4005429 (POETTINGER ALOIS LANDMASCH [DE]) [AD] 4-7* abstract *; | [A]DE4223951 (BOESE PETER DR ING [DE]) [A] 4,5 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4005429 |