EP3188366 - BULK ACOUSTIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cree, Inc. 4600 Silicon Drive Durham, NC 27703 / US | [2017/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHITNIS, Ashay 5362 Hollister Avenue Apt. 16 Santa Barbara, CA California 93111 / US | [2017/27] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/35] |
Former [2017/27] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16199608.7 | 13.05.2008 | [2017/27] | Priority number, date | US20070803449 | 14.05.2007 Original published format: US 803449 | [2017/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3188366 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3188366 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3188366 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H03H3/02, H03H3/04, H03H9/05, H03H9/17 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
H03H3/04 (EP,US);
H03H9/0542 (EP,US);
H03H9/174 (EP,US);
H03H2003/023 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/20] |
Former [2017/27] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | BAW-VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2017/27] | English: | BULK ACOUSTIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FABRICATING | [2017/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE VOLUME ACOUSTIQUE | [2017/27] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 26.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08251672.5 / EP1993205 | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 13.05.2021 | [2022/22] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005184627 (SANO KENYA [JP], et al); | [XYI]US2005255234 (KANDA ATSUHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US2006037183 (IWASHITA SETSUYA [JP], et al); | [Y]DE102004037818 (EPCOS AG [DE]); | [X]US2006145785 (ISHII MOTONORI [JP], et al); | US2008246556 [ ] (HEINZE HABBO [DE], et al) |