EP3156486 - RNAI-MEDIATED INHIBITION OF SPLEEN TYROSINE KINASE-RELATED INFLAMMATORY CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arrowhead Research Corporation 225 South Lake Avenue, Suite 300 Pasadena, CA 91101 / US | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANNI, John M. 2821 Donnybrook Drive Burleson, TX 76028 / US | 02 /
CHATTERTON, Jon E. RNAeye Therapeutics 3 Front Row Alisio Viejo, CA 92656 / US | 03 /
GAMACHE, Daniel A. 5610 Hunterwood Lane Arlington, TX 76017 / US | 04 /
MILLER, Steven T. 5902 Canberra Lane Arlington, TX 76017 / US | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/16] | Application number, filing date | 16199741.6 | 13.04.2007 | [2017/16] | Priority number, date | US20060791847P | 13.04.2006 Original published format: US 791847 P | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3156486 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3156486 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/713 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
C12N15/1137 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61K31/7105 (US);
A61K31/713 (US);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07H21/02 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | RNAI-VERMITTELTE HEMMUNG VON ENTZÜNDUNGSERKRANKUNGEN IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT MILZ-TYROSINKINASE | [2017/16] | English: | RNAI-MEDIATED INHIBITION OF SPLEEN TYROSINE KINASE-RELATED INFLAMMATORY CONDITIONS | [2017/16] | French: | INHIBITION VÉHICULÉE PAR ARNI DE CONDITIONS INFLAMMATOIRES DE LA RATE LIÉES À LA KINASE DE TYROSINE | [2017/16] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 21.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 21.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07760636.6 / EP2004240 | EP13176714.7 / EP2662446 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005049838 (UNIV YALE [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * pages 12,13,15; tables 1,4; sequence 4 *; | [Y]WO2005085443 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * table 5 *; | [Y]WO2005007623 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005227935 (MCSWIGGEN JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * table II *; | [Y] - GEVREY JEAN-CLAUDE ET AL, "Syk is required for monocyte/macrophage chemotaxis to CX3CL1 (fractalkine)", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (200509), vol. 175, no. 6, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 3737 - 3745, XP002600264 [Y] 1-14 * page 3738, column r * | [A] - TAKADA Y ET AL, "TNF activates Syk protein tyrosine kinase leading to TNF-induced MAPK activation, NF-KB activation, and apoptosis", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (20040715), vol. 173, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 1066 - 1077, XP002336041 [A] 1-14 * page 1067, column l * | [A] - POPESCU FLORIN-DAN, "Antisense- and RNA interference-based therapeutic strategies in allergy", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR MEDICINE, UNIVERSITY PRESS CAROL DAVILA, BUCHAREST, RO LNKD- DOI:10.1111/J.1582-4934.2005.TB00383.X, (2005), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 1582-1838, pages 840 - 853, XP002526786 [A] 1-14 * table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1582-4934.2005.tb00383.x | by applicant | WO2005007623 | WO2005085443 | US5360720 | - STENTON, G.R., JLMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 169, pages 1028 - 1036 | - MILLER ET AL., OCULAR IMMUNOL INFLAMM., (2006), vol. 4, pages 39 - 49 | - LEUK RES., (200308), vol. 27, no. 8, pages 677 - 682 | - BRUMMELKAMP, T.R. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, page 550 | - CASTANOTTO, D. ET AL., RNA, (2002), vol. 8, page 1454 | - D.-H. ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200502), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 222 - 226 | - ALTSCHUL, S.F. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - OFFORD ET AL., INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI., (1999), vol. 40, pages 1091 - 1101 |