EP3170879 - ABRASIVE GRAIN WITH A SURFACE CONTAINING AT LEAST ONE BASE SURFACE WITH AN OUTER CONTOUR HAVING AT LEAST SEVEN CORNERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/21] | ABRASIVE GRIT COMPRISING FIRST SURFACE WITHOUT CORNER AND SECOND SURFACE WITH CORNER | ||
[2021/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2017/21] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hejtmann, Georg Seelhofenstr. 43 74395 Mundelsheim / DE | 02 /
Lindemann, Gert Lerchenweg 10 72805 Lichtenstein / DE | 03 /
Stedile, Petra Langer Weg 5 73732 Esslingen / DE | 04 /
Fuenfschilling, Stefan Thundorferstrasse 58b 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | 05 /
Jenni, Adrian Turnerstr. 28 9000 St. Gallen / CH | 06 /
Pleschinger, Tony Bruehlstr. 9 71679 Asperg / DE | [2017/21] | Application number, filing date | 16199983.4 | 31.07.2013 | [2017/21] | Priority number, date | EP20120178931 | 02.08.2012 Original published format: EP 12178931 | DE201210213629 | 02.08.2012 Original published format: DE102012213629 | EP20120178937 | 02.08.2012 Original published format: EP 12178937 | DE201210213632 | 02.08.2012 Original published format: DE102012213632 | [2017/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3170879 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3170879 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3170879 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/14, B24D3/14, C04B35/111, C04B35/626 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
C09K3/1409 (EP,CN,US);
B24D3/14 (CN);
C04B35/1115 (EP,CN,US);
C04B35/6261 (EP,CN,US);
C09K3/1418 (US);
C09K3/1427 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/6027 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,CN,US);
C04B2235/94 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] |
Former [2017/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHLEIFKORN MIT EINER OBERFLÄCHE, DIE MINDESTENS EINE GRUNDFLÄCHE MIT EINER AUSSENKONTUR ENTHÄLT, DIE MINDESTENS SIEBEN ECKEN AUFWEIST | [2021/13] | English: | ABRASIVE GRAIN WITH A SURFACE CONTAINING AT LEAST ONE BASE SURFACE WITH AN OUTER CONTOUR HAVING AT LEAST SEVEN CORNERS | [2021/13] | French: | GRAIN ABRASIF AYANT UNE SURFACE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UNE SURFACE DE BASE AVEC UN CONTOUR EXTÉRIEUR AYANT AU MOINS SEPT COINS | [2021/13] |
Former [2017/21] | SCHLEIFKORN, ENTHALTEND EINE ERSTE FLÄCHE OHNE ECKE UND ZWEITE FLÄCHE MIT ECKE | ||
Former [2017/21] | ABRASIVE GRIT COMPRISING FIRST SURFACE WITHOUT CORNER AND SECOND SURFACE WITH CORNER | ||
Former [2017/21] | GRAIN ABRASIF COMPRENANT UNE PREMIÈRE SURFACE SANS ANGLE ET UNE SECONDE SURFACE AVEC ANGLE | Examination procedure | 22.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 20.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13744534.2 / EP2880117 | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2013 | AL | 08.09.2021 | CY | 08.09.2021 | CZ | 08.09.2021 | DK | 08.09.2021 | EE | 08.09.2021 | ES | 08.09.2021 | FI | 08.09.2021 | HR | 08.09.2021 | IT | 08.09.2021 | LT | 08.09.2021 | LV | 08.09.2021 | MC | 08.09.2021 | MK | 08.09.2021 | MT | 08.09.2021 | NL | 08.09.2021 | PL | 08.09.2021 | RO | 08.09.2021 | RS | 08.09.2021 | SE | 08.09.2021 | SI | 08.09.2021 | SK | 08.09.2021 | SM | 08.09.2021 | BG | 08.12.2021 | NO | 08.12.2021 | GR | 09.12.2021 | IS | 08.01.2022 | PT | 10.01.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 31.07.2013 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
MK | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 31.07.2013 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
CY | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 31.07.2013 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
IT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 08.09.2021 | |
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 08.09.2021 | |
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 08.09.2021 | |
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
ES | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/10] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 08.09.2021 | |
NO | 08.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012167481 (YENER DORUK O [US], et al) [X] 1,10,13,15 * figures 1-3; claims 1, 26, 29 * * the whole document * [I] 2-9,12; | [XI]US5681217 (HOOPMAN TIMOTHY L [US], et al) [X] 1,10,13,15 * column 16, lines 42-55; figure 10 * * the whole document * [I] 2-9,12; | [XI]US5989111 (LAMPHERE CRAIG F [US], et al) [X] 1,10,13,15 * column 16, lines 20-34; figure 1; claim 13 * * the whole document * [I] 2-9,12; | [XDI]US5201916 (BERG TODD A [US], et al) [XD] 11 * example 11; claim 1 * * the whole document * [I] 14 | by applicant | US5201916 | EP0615816 | WO2009085841 | WO2010077495 | WO2010077518 | WO2010077491 | WO2010077519 | WO2011068724 | WO2011109188 | WO2010077509 | WO2011068714 | WO2011139562 | WO2012018903 | WO2012061016 | WO9612776 | WO2011087649 | WO2012061033 |