EP3176383 - HT ENHANCEMENT BUMPS/FEATURES ON COLD SIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAPLETON, David Scott 1000 Western Ave Lynn, MA Massachusetts 01905 / US | 02 /
BALDIGA, Jonathan David 1000 Western Ave Lynn, MA Massachusetts 01905 / US | 03 /
CORMAN, Gregory Scot One Research Circle Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Jens Peter General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [2017/23] | Application number, filing date | 16199988.3 | 22.11.2016 | [2017/23] | Priority number, date | US201514956875 | 02.12.2015 Original published format: US201514956875 | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3176383 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/24, F01D25/12, F23R3/00 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
F01D25/12 (EP,US);
F01D25/14 (CN);
B28B11/24 (US);
B28B3/12 (US);
F01D11/24 (EP,US);
F01D9/04 (US);
F02C3/04 (US);
F23R3/002 (US);
F23R3/007 (EP,US);
F05D2220/32 (CN,US);
F05D2230/26 (US);
F05D2240/11 (EP,US);
F05D2240/35 (US);
F05D2240/81 (EP,US);
F05D2250/12 (EP,US);
F05D2250/185 (EP,US);
F05D2250/22 (EP,US);
F05D2250/231 (EP,US);
F05D2250/232 (EP,US);
F05D2250/24 (EP,US);
F05D2250/241 (EP,US);
F05D2260/201 (EP,US);
F05D2260/221 (CN);
F05D2260/2214 (US);
F05D2260/22141 (EP,US);
F05D2300/6033 (EP,US);
F23R2900/00018 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÖCKER/MERKMALE ZUR HOCHFESTIGKEITSERHÖHUNG AN DER KALTEN SEITE | [2017/23] | English: | HT ENHANCEMENT BUMPS/FEATURES ON COLD SIDE | [2017/23] | French: | BOSSES/CARACTÉRISTIQUES D'AMÉLIORATION HAUTE TÉNACITÉ SUR LE CÔTÉ FROID | [2017/23] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/25] | 24.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009035487 (SIEMENS ENERGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 9 * * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 27 * * page 16, line 10 - page 17, line 5 * * figures 5A-5C * * claims 1,5,7 * [I] 8; | [I]WO2015116937 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0003] * * paragraphs [0006] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0063] - [0075] * * figures 6-13 *; | [XI]US2014271153 (USKERT RICHARD C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0016] - [0024] * * figures 1-2 * * claims 1,7,9 * [I] 4,8; | [XA]EP2728125 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0030] * * paragraph [0035] * * figures 2-3,7 * [A] 10 |