EP3176424 - DEVICE FOR CONVERTING WAVE ENERGY INTO ELECTRICAL ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TETRASAN GmbH Spezialproblemlösungen für Asbestsanierung, Betonsanierung, Denkmalsanierung Ehrwalderstr. 77 81377 München / DE | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPADOPOULOS, Tilemachos-Dimitrios Palmstr. 4 80469 München / DE | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Lambacher, Michael, et al V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Postfach 95 01 60 81517 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | Lambacher, Michael, et al Euromarkpat V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16200145.7 | 23.11.2016 | [2017/23] | Priority number, date | DE201520106549U | 02.12.2015 Original published format: DE 202015106549 U | [2017/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3176424 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/18 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
F03B13/1845 (EP);
F05B2220/707 (EP);
F05B2240/93 (EP);
F05B2240/931 (EP);
Y02E10/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON WELLENKRAFT IN ELEKTRISCHE ENERGIE | [2017/23] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONVERTING WAVE ENERGY INTO ELECTRICAL ENERGY | [2017/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION D'ÉNERGIE ONDULATOIRE EN ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2017/23] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 26.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006208839 (TAYLOR GEORGE W [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0011] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraphs [0089] - [0094] * * figures 1E-1H, 4A-4B, 7 * [Y] 2,5; | [A]GB2465642 (WAVEBOB LTD [IE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 3, line 29 - page 5, line 17 ** figures 1-2 *; | [Y]WO2013156584 (WEISS OLIVER [ES]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * page 5, lines 9-19 * * page 8, lines 21-25 * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US8629572 (PHILLIPS REED E [US]) [Y] 2 * abstract * * figures 3-7 * |