EP3327988 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING MULTICAST LATENCY AND RELIABILITY OF MULTICAST TRANSMISSIONS IN A WIRELESS BUILDING AUTOMATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANG, Zhibo Råbocksvägen 21 722 42 Västerås / SE | 02 /
BAG, Gargi Klockartorpsgatan 25C 723 44 Västerås / SE | 03 /
SCHMITT, Johannes Vorderer Rindweg 21A 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Jin, Xiao-Hong ABB AB Intellectual Property Forskargränd 7 721 78 Västerås / SE | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 16200154.9 | 23.11.2016 | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3327988 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
H04L12/185 (EP);
H04L12/1863 (EP);
H04L12/189 (EP);
H04L12/1895 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER MULTICAST-LATENZ UND DER ZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT VON MULTICAST-ÜBERTRAGUNGEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN GEBÄUDEAUTOMATIONSNETZWERK | [2018/22] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING MULTICAST LATENCY AND RELIABILITY OF MULTICAST TRANSMISSIONS IN A WIRELESS BUILDING AUTOMATION NETWORK | [2018/22] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'AMÉLIORER LA LATENCE DE MULTIDIFFUSION ET LA FIABILITÉ DES TRANSMISSIONS DE MULTIDIFFUSION DANS UN RÉSEAU SANS FIL D'AUTOMATISATION DE BÂTIMENT | [2018/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/22] | 14.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2015124807 (MARTIN TIMOTHY [US], et al) [I] 1,7 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 19, paragraph 146 * [Y] 2-6,8; | [IY]US8958286 (ATLAS ALIA [US], et al) [I] 1,7 * column 1, line 6 - column 58, line 8 * [Y] 2-6,8; | [A]EP0800329 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 5 - column 19, line 22 *; | [A]US8250426 (LARSSON PETER [SE]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 11 - column 18, line 64 *; | [A]US2016277201 (THUBERT PASCAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 8, paragraph 75 * | by applicant | US2014065999 | US2004071128 | US2014226557 | CN101621747 |