EP3179035 - TURBINE BLADE WITH AIRFOIL TIP VORTEX CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWIS, Scott D. 9 Grandview Terrace Vernon, CT Connecticut 06066 / US | 02 /
LANA, Kyle C. 4 Eleanor Lane Portland, CT Connecticut 06480 / US | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/01] |
Former [2017/24] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16200354.5 | 23.11.2016 | [2017/24] | Priority number, date | US201562258834P | 23.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562258834 P | US201615018072 | 08.02.2016 Original published format: US201615018072 | [2017/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3179035 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3179035 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14, F01D5/20, F01D11/08, F01D5/06, F02C3/04, F04D29/32, F04D29/68 | [2019/29] | CPC: |
F01D5/141 (EP,US);
F01D5/145 (US);
F01D11/08 (EP,US);
F01D5/06 (US);
F01D5/20 (EP,US);
F02C3/04 (US);
F04D29/324 (US);
F04D29/681 (US);
F05D2220/32 (EP,US);
F05D2240/305 (US);
F05D2240/307 (EP,US);
F05D2240/35 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/24] | F01D5/14, F01D5/20, F01D11/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] |
Former [2017/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TURBINENSCHAUFEL MIT SPITZENWIRBELREDUZIERUNG | [2017/24] | English: | TURBINE BLADE WITH AIRFOIL TIP VORTEX CONTROL | [2017/24] | French: | AUBE DE TURBINE POUR LA RÉDUCTION DU TOURBILLON D'EXTRÉMITÉ | [2017/24] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 14.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2016 | AL | 01.01.2020 | AT | 01.01.2020 | CY | 01.01.2020 | CZ | 01.01.2020 | DK | 01.01.2020 | EE | 01.01.2020 | ES | 01.01.2020 | FI | 01.01.2020 | HR | 01.01.2020 | IT | 01.01.2020 | LT | 01.01.2020 | LV | 01.01.2020 | MC | 01.01.2020 | MK | 01.01.2020 | MT | 01.01.2020 | NL | 01.01.2020 | PL | 01.01.2020 | RO | 01.01.2020 | RS | 01.01.2020 | SE | 01.01.2020 | SI | 01.01.2020 | SK | 01.01.2020 | SM | 01.01.2020 | TR | 01.01.2020 | BG | 01.04.2020 | NO | 01.04.2020 | GR | 02.04.2020 | IS | 01.05.2020 | PT | 27.05.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 23.11.2016 | |
AL | 01.01.2020 | ||
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
IT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.11.2016 | |
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
IT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
IT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
IT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 01.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003059309 (SZUCS PETER NICHOLAS [US], et al) [A] 2-5* figure 4 *; | [XY]US2006051209 (LEE CHING-PANG [US], et al) [X] 1,5-9,11-13 * figures 1-3 * [Y] 14,15; | [XY]US2007258815 (LIANG GEORGE [US]) [X] 1,6,7,11-13 * figures 1-2 * [Y] 14,15; | [XY]US2010303625 (KUHNE CRAIG MILLER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-13 * figures 1-2 * [Y] 14,15; | [Y]EP2333242 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 14,15 * figures 2-4, 5A, 5B; claims 1-9 *; | [XY]WO2015094498 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9,11-13 * paragraphs [0046] - [0052]; figures 2, 4, 7; claim 4 * [Y] 14,15 |