Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
10.01.2019 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.01.2019 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.08.2018 | Change - representative | |
27.04.2018 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
30.11.2016 | Change - representative |