EP3326816 - A PROCESS FOR REVERSIBLY CONNECTING AT LEAST TWO ELEMENTS WITH 3D PRINTED CONNECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique SA - Recherche et Développement Rue Jaquet-Droz 1 2002 Neuchâtel / CH | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANI, Sébastien Route des hauts genevrés 59 1784 Courtepin / CH | 02 /
BARROT, François Vinelzstrasse 8 3235 Erlach / CH | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | Gevers SA Rue des Noyers 11 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 16201181.1 | 29.11.2016 | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3326816 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B33Y80/00, F16B5/06, // F16B21/07, F16B33/00, F16B1/00 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
F16B5/0642 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP);
B81C3/008 (EP);
F16B5/065 (EP);
F16B21/073 (EP);
F16B2200/93 (EP);
F16B33/004 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM REVERSIBLEN VERBINDEN VON MINDESTENS ZWEI ELEMENTEN MIT 3D-GEDRUCKTEN VERBINDERN | [2018/22] | English: | A PROCESS FOR REVERSIBLY CONNECTING AT LEAST TWO ELEMENTS WITH 3D PRINTED CONNECTORS | [2018/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SOLIDARISATION RÉVERSIBLE DE DEUX ÉLÉMENTS AU MOINS AVEC CONNECTEURS RÉALISÉS PAR IMPRESSION 3D | [2018/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/23] | 11.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5411400 (SUBRAHMANYAN RAVICHANDRAN [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8,9,15 * figures 1-9 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, lines 38-45,60-62 * * column 4, lines 30-64 * * column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 33 * [Y] 10-14,16; | [YA]US2007148817 (WILLIAMS VERNON M [US], et al) [Y] 10-14,16 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0017] - [0018] - [0023] - [0025] - [0028] , [0031] - [0032] - [0046] - [0052] - [0058] - [0059] *[A] 2,3,5; | [X]WO2012166552 (RAYMOND A & CIE [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9 * figures 3-5 * * paragraphs [0098] - [0099] - [0174] - [0175] *; | [X]WO2012166532 (RAYMOND A & CIE [FR], et al) [X] 1,3 * figures 1-3,5,6A-6C * * paragraphs [0006] - [0007] - [0017] , [0019] , [0027] *; | [XI]EP3045739 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] * [I] 6 | by applicant | US6393685 | WO2007017458 | WO2011071212 |