EP3330214 - METHOD FOR PRODUCTION AND DISPENSING CARBONATED BEER FROM BEER CONCENTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.06.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anheuser-Busch InBev S.A. Grand Place 1 1000 Brussels / BE | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | BiiP bv Engels Plein 3 bus 102 3000 Leuven / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/23] | BiiP cvba Culliganlaan 1B 1831 Diegem (Bruxelles) / BE | Application number, filing date | 16201425.2 | 30.11.2016 | [2018/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3330214 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/00 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
B67D1/0072 (EP,KR,US);
B67D1/0021 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND ZUR AUSGABE VON KOHLENSÄUREHALTIGEN BIER HERGESTELLT AUS KONZENTRAT | [2018/23] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCTION AND DISPENSING CARBONATED BEER FROM BEER CONCENTRATE | [2018/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET DISTRIBUTION DE BIÈRE CARBONATÉE À BASE D'UN CONCENTRÉ | [2018/23] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2018/44] | 24.06.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4520950 (JEANS EDWARD L [GB]) [X] 1,8-10,13 * column 1, lines 10-12 * * column 2, line 22 - line 48 * * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 63 * * column 6, line 55 - column 8, line 65 * * column 11, line 40 - column 12, line 39 * * column 13, line 15 - line 61 * * column 18, line 51 - line 54 * * column 18, line 57 - column 19, line 15 * * column 27, line 23 - line 51 * * figures 12A, 2B, 3, 6, 10, 12, 13, 22 * [Y] 3-7,11,14,15 [I] 2,12; | [Y]DE1757283 (CORNELIUS CO) [Y] 3,4,14,15 * column 2, line 4 - line 30 * * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 16 * * column 5, line 5 - line 27 * * figure 1 *; | [YA]EP2070587 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [Y] 5-7 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 14] , [0 17] , [0 22] - [0026] - [0 48] * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1; | [YA]EP0296570 (AQUATEC INC [US]) [Y] 11 * page 8, line 35 - line 48 * * figure 5 * [A] 1; | [A]GB1012408 (CANADIAN BREWERIES LTD) [A] 1 * page 2, line 80 - page 3, line 24; figure 1 *; | [A]US3991219 (KUCKENS ALEXANDER) [A] 1 * column 2, line 53 - line 61 * * column 5, line 17 - line 33 * * column 6, line 47 - line 55 * * figures 4, 7 *; | [A]EP2889264 (ANHEUSER BUSCH INBEV SA [BE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0083] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | - CHEMICAL ENGINEERING SCIENCE, (200201), vol. 57, no. 1, pages 197 - 205 | - CHEMICAL ENGINEERING SCIENCE, (199204), vol. 47, no. 5, pages 1079 - 1089 |