Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3184427T | 28.02.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR1502660 | 21.12.2015 | EP16202349 | 06.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10220943 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2019 | B2 | US2017174340 | 22.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1502660 | 21.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101898553B | Global Dossier | 13.09.2018 | B1 | KR20170074175 | 29.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1502660 | 21.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6336018B | Global Dossier | 06.06.2018 | B2 | JP2017141013 | 17.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1502660 | 21.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106892105B | Global Dossier | 13.12.2019 | B | CN106892105 | 27.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1502660 | 21.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2951073 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2019 | C | CA2951073 | 07.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1502660 | 21.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3184427 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2018 | B1 | EP3184427 | 28.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1502660 | 21.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3045564 | 17.08.2018 | B1 | FR3045564 | 23.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1502660 | 21.12.2015 |