EP3178799 - ABRADABLE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR CMC SHROUDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirby, Glen Harold 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | 02 /
Manicke, Paul Stephen 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Foster, Christopher Michael, et al General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Pöpper, Evamaria, et al General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 16202472.3 | 06.12.2016 | [2017/24] | Priority number, date | US201514963448 | 09.12.2015 Original published format: US201514963448 | [2017/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3178799 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/495, C04B41/87, C04B41/89, C04B35/565, C04B35/80, C04B41/00, C04B41/50, C04B41/52, F01D5/28 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
F01D25/24 (CN);
C04B35/495 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5072 (US);
C04B41/52 (EP,US);
C04B41/89 (EP,US);
C23C4/04 (CN);
F01D11/001 (EP,US);
F01D25/005 (CN);
F01D9/04 (US);
C04B2111/00405 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3227 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3287 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
F01D11/122 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2230/90 (US);
F05D2300/13 (EP,US);
F05D2300/131 (EP,US);
F05D2300/15 (EP,US);
F05D2300/17 (US);
F05D2300/5021 (CN);
F05D2300/6033 (EP,US);
F05D2300/611 (CN,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/565, C04B35/806 (EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/5024, C04B2103/001 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/5024, C04B2103/0021 (US,EP);
C04B41/52, C04B41/5024, C04B41/524, C04B2103/0021 (EP,US);
C04B41/52, C04B41/5024, C04B41/526, C04B2103/0021 (EP,US);
C04B41/52, C04B41/5027 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABREIBBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR CMC-UMMANTELUNGEN | [2017/24] | English: | ABRADABLE COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR CMC SHROUDS | [2017/24] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ABRADABLES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR ENVELOPPE CMC | [2017/24] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/26] | 22.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2192098 (ROLLS ROYCE CORP [US]) [I] 1-10 * whole document - but see in particular p. 8, right hand col., l. 53-p.9, left hand col., l. 1 & p.9, left hand col., lines 41-52, and paragraph [0066]; claims 1, 4, 9 & 10 *; | [IA]WO2015183439 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [I] 10 * the whole document * [A] 1-9; | [XP]WO2016003571 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [XP] 10 * paragraphs [0028], [0035], [0038], [0039] & [0041]; figure 2 and paragraph [0045] * | [A] - G BLASSE, "CRYSTAL STRUCTURE AND FLUORESCENCE OF COMPOUNDS LnzMe4+Me6+O8", JOURNAL OF INORGANIC AND NUCLEAR CHEMISTRY, (19680101), vol. 30, pages 2091 - 2099, XP055225897 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |