EP3333694 - PRINTING SYSTEM WITH POWER-SAVE MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCE Holding B.V. St. Urbanusweg 43 P.O. Box 101 5914 CA Venlo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/24] | For all designated states OCE Holding B.V. St. Urbanusweg 43 P.O.Box 101 5914 CA Venlo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISTOR, Mircea St. Urbanusweg 43 5914 CA Venlo / NL | 02 /
VARGA, Andrei N. St. Urbanusweg 43 5914 CA Venlo / NL | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Canon Production Printing IP Department Canon Production Printing Netherlands B.V. Van der Grintenstraat 10 5914 HH Venlo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/24] | OCE IP Department St. Urbanusweg 43 5914 CA Venlo / NL | Application number, filing date | 16202804.7 | 08.12.2016 | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3333694 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
G06F3/1221 (EP);
G06F3/1229 (EP);
G06F3/1285 (EP);
Y02D10/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKSYSTEM MIT ENERGIESPARMODUS | [2018/24] | English: | PRINTING SYSTEM WITH POWER-SAVE MODE | [2018/24] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IMPRESSION AYANT UN MODE ÉCONOMIE D'ÉNERGIE | [2018/24] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2007055129 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [X] 1,3,6 * paragraphs [0033] - [0049] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0080] * * figures 2,4,5 * [I] 2,4,5,7 | by applicant | US9152359 |