EP3182141 - COMPENSATION SIGNAL CIRCUIT FOR COMPENSATING MAGNETISATION ERRORS IN CURRENT TRANSFORMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hozoi, Adrian Am Rheinauer See 17 68219 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Kaul, Holger Hauptstr. 49A 74850 Schefflenz / DE | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | Marks, Frank ABB AG GF-IP Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 16202887.2 | 08.12.2016 | [2017/25] | Priority number, date | EP20150199390 | 10.12.2015 Original published format: EP 15199390 | [2017/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3182141 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/08, G01R15/18, // G01R19/00, G01R19/02, G01R19/22, H02H1/06, H01F27/42, H01F38/38 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
G01R15/183 (EP);
G01R19/0023 (EP);
G01R19/22 (EP);
H01F27/427 (EP);
H01F38/38 (EP);
H02H1/0007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/03] |
Former [2017/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSGLEICHSSCHALTUNG ZUR KOMPENSATION VON MAGNETISIERUNGSFEHLERN IN STROMWANDLERN | [2017/25] | English: | COMPENSATION SIGNAL CIRCUIT FOR COMPENSATING MAGNETISATION ERRORS IN CURRENT TRANSFORMERS | [2017/25] | French: | CIRCUIT DE SIGNAL DE COMPENSATION POUR COMPENSER UNE ERREUR DE MAGNÉTISATION DANS UN TRANSFORMATEUR DE COURANT | [2017/25] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0289042 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]US4870532 (BEATTY JR WILLIAM E [US], et al); | [A]US5841264 (CAEN CLAUDE [FR]); | [Y]US2002070724 (EDEL THOMAS G [US]); | [A]US2012176120 (JEFFERIES KEVIN [US]); |