EP3184739 - MULTI-WALL BLADE WITH COOLING CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/26] | COOLING CIRCUITS FOR A MULTI-WALL BLADE | ||
[2018/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Aaron Ezekiel 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH 45215 / US | 02 /
FOSTER, Gregory Thomas 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC 29615 / US | [2018/40] |
Former [2017/26] | 01 /
SMITH, Aaron Ezekiel 1 Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | ||
02 /
FOSTER, Gregory Thomas 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/26] | Lee, Brenda GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16203125.6 | 09.12.2016 | [2017/26] | Priority number, date | US201514977270 | 21.12.2015 Original published format: US201514977270 | [2017/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3184739 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3184739 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F01D5/186 (CN,US);
F02C3/04 (US);
F02C7/18 (US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2240/35 (US);
F05D2240/81 (US);
F05D2250/185 (EP,US);
F05D2260/201 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] |
Former [2017/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEHRWANDIGE SCHAUFEL MIT KÜHLKREISLAUF | [2018/12] | English: | MULTI-WALL BLADE WITH COOLING CIRCUIT | [2018/12] | French: | AUBE À PAROIS MULTIPLES AVEC CIRCUIT DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2018/12] |
Former [2017/26] | KÜHLKREISLÄUFE FÜR MEHRWANDIGE SCHAUFEL | ||
Former [2017/26] | COOLING CIRCUITS FOR A MULTI-WALL BLADE | ||
Former [2017/26] | CIRCUITS DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR UNE AUBE À PAROIS MULTIPLES | Examination procedure | 09.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 18.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2016 | AL | 03.10.2018 | AT | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | DK | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | ES | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | IT | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MK | 03.10.2018 | NL | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | RS | 03.10.2018 | SE | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | SM | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | IE | 09.12.2018 | LU | 09.12.2018 | MT | 09.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | FR | 31.12.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | NO | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
MT | 09.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
MT | 09.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
IE | 09.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 09.12.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 03.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002242607 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,7,8,10,11 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2006222495 (LIANG GEORGE [US]) [A] 9* paragraph [0006]; figures 3-5 *; | [Y]EP2037081 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 4-6 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2009104042 (LIANG GEORGE [US]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * paragraphs [0023] - [0032]; figures 2-4 *; | [X]US7527474 (LIANG GEORGE [US]) [X] 1,10,11 * abstract *; | [Y]US8292582 (LIANG GEORGE [US]) [Y] 3 * figures 7,8,10 *; | [XY]US8444386 (LIANG GEORGE [US]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * figures 4,8-12 * [Y] 3-6 |