EP3182101 - SYSTEM FOR OPTICAL DETECTION OF THE FLANGE OF A SYRINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/25] | SYSTEM FOR OPTICALLY DETECTING AN EXAMINATION OF A GLASS BODY | ||
[2024/29] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gerresheimer Bünde GmbH Erich-Martens-Strasse 26-32 32257 Bünde / DE | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Acker, Wolfram Gerresheimer Bünde GmbH Wiehenstraße 29a 32257 Bünde / DE | 02 /
Hellmich, Matthias Gerresheimer Bünde GmbH Im Westerfeld 32 32257 Bünde / DE | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Holz, Christian, et al Osterstraße 27 30159 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | Holz, Christian Berliner Allee 12a 30175 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 16203283.3 | 09.12.2016 | [2017/25] | Priority number, date | DE201510121758 | 14.12.2015 Original published format: DE102015121758 | [2017/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3182101 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/31, G01N21/90, A61M5/50, G01B11/08, G01N21/958 | [2024/29] | CPC: |
G01N21/90 (EP);
G01B11/08 (EP);
G01N21/958 (EP);
A61M5/3129 (EP);
A61M5/5086 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/25] | G01N21/90, G01N21/958, // A61M5/50, G01B11/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] |
Former [2017/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR OPTISCHEN ERFASSUNG DER FINGERAUFLAGE EINER GLASSPRITZE | [2024/29] | English: | SYSTEM FOR OPTICAL DETECTION OF THE FLANGE OF A SYRINGE | [2024/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION OPTIQUE DU FLANC D'UN SERINGUE EN VERRE | [2024/29] |
Former [2017/25] | SYSTEM ZUR OPTISCHEN ERFASSUNG EINES UNTERSUCHUNGSBEREICHS EINES GLASKÖRPERS | ||
Former [2017/25] | SYSTEM FOR OPTICALLY DETECTING AN EXAMINATION OF A GLASS BODY | ||
Former [2017/25] | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION OPTIQUE D'UNE ZONE D'ANALYSE D'UN CORPS EN VERRE | Examination procedure | 09.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 12.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0683388 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]); | [XI]EP0764846 (OWENS BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER [US]); | [I]EP2381246 (BECTON DICKINSON FRANCE [FR]); | [A]EP2851677 (GERRESHEIMER BÜNDE GMBH [DE]) |