EP3181408 - VEHICLE REAR LIGHT, SIGNALLING AND LIGHTING SYSTEM FOR VEHICLE AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vignal Systems 19 Avenue du 24 Août 1944 69960 Corbas / FR | [2017/32] |
Former [2017/25] | For all designated states Vignal Systems 19 avenue du 24 aout 1944 69960 Corbas / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dupuis, Guillaume 114 cours Tolstoi 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Delorme, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2017/25] | Application number, filing date | 16203532.3 | 12.12.2016 | [2017/25] | Priority number, date | FR20150062387 | 15.12.2015 Original published format: FR 1562387 | [2017/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3181408 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3181408 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/03, B60Q1/26 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
B60R16/03 (EP);
B60Q1/0088 (EP);
B60Q1/2607 (EP);
B60Q1/2696 (EP);
B60Q1/305 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/47] |
Former [2017/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RÜCKLICHT EINES FAHRZEUGS, SIGNALISIERUNGS- UND BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM EINES FAHRZEUGS UND ENTSPRECHENDES FAHRZEUG | [2017/25] | English: | VEHICLE REAR LIGHT, SIGNALLING AND LIGHTING SYSTEM FOR VEHICLE AND VEHICLE | [2017/25] | French: | FEU ARRIÈRE DE VÉHICULE, SYSTÈME DE SIGNALISATION ET D ÉCLAIRAGE DE VÉHICULE ET VÉHICULE | [2017/25] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/47] | 24.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2016 | AL | 02.05.2018 | AT | 02.05.2018 | CY | 02.05.2018 | CZ | 02.05.2018 | DK | 02.05.2018 | EE | 02.05.2018 | ES | 02.05.2018 | FI | 02.05.2018 | HR | 02.05.2018 | IT | 02.05.2018 | LT | 02.05.2018 | LV | 02.05.2018 | MC | 02.05.2018 | MK | 02.05.2018 | MT | 02.05.2018 | NL | 02.05.2018 | PL | 02.05.2018 | PT | 02.05.2018 | RO | 02.05.2018 | RS | 02.05.2018 | SE | 02.05.2018 | SI | 02.05.2018 | SK | 02.05.2018 | SM | 02.05.2018 | TR | 02.05.2018 | BG | 02.08.2018 | NO | 02.08.2018 | GR | 03.08.2018 | IS | 02.09.2018 | IE | 12.12.2018 | LU | 12.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 12.12.2016 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MK | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.12.2018 | ||
LU | 12.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.12.2018 | ||
LU | 12.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.12.2018 | ||
LU | 12.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.12.2018 | ||
LU | 12.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.12.2018 | ||
LU | 12.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 12.12.2018 | ||
LU | 12.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 12.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02062623 (DONNELLY CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 5, line 3 - line 10 * * page 15, line 12 - line 21 * * page 46, line 10 - line 23; figures 4,5,14 * * abstract *; | [A]EP1298009 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]FR2917347 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [A]US2010019689 (SHAN XINXIN [CA]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP2172371 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 21] - [0031]; figure 3 * * abstract * |