EP3184680 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN APPLICATION PROCESS FOR REAPPLICATION OF A YARN ON A WORKSTATION OF A TEXTILE MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rieter Ingolstadt GmbH Despag-Straße 6 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [2021/50] |
Former [2017/26] | For all designated states Rieter Ingolstadt GmbH Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPHAN, Adalbert Am Haar 23 92339 Beilngries Paulushofen / DE | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Despag-Straße 6 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/26] | Bergmeier, Werner Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 16203779.0 | 13.12.2016 | [2017/26] | Priority number, date | DE201510122391 | 21.12.2015 Original published format: DE102015122391 | [2017/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3184680 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | D01H4/50, B65H54/26, B65H67/08, D01H4/48, D01H15/00 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
D01H4/50 (EP,US);
D01H4/48 (CN,US);
B65H54/26 (EP,US);
B65H67/081 (EP,US);
B65H69/061 (EP,US);
D01H15/00 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] |
Former [2017/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES ANSETZPROZESSES ZUM WIEDERANSETZEN EINES GARNS AN EINER ARBEITSSTELLE EINER TEXTILMASCHINE | [2017/26] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN APPLICATION PROCESS FOR REAPPLICATION OF A YARN ON A WORKSTATION OF A TEXTILE MACHINE | [2017/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN PROCESSUS DE POSE DESTINÉ À RATTACHER UN FIL DANS UN POSTE DE TRAVAIL D'UNE MACHINE TEXTILE | [2017/26] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 12.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4222377 (SCHLAFHORST & CO W [DE]); | [A]JPH0931769 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS); | [XD]DE4418743 (RIETER INGOLSTADT SPINNEREI [DE]); | [X]DE102012100553 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) | by applicant | DE3502118 | DE4418743 |